IL SJR0040 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-3)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-3)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares May 6-10, 2019 as "Teacher Appreciation Week" in the State of Illinois.
Title
TEACHER APPRECIATION WEEK
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Adopted Both Houses |
2019-06-01 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-23 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 017-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-05-23 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-05-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-05-09 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=40&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SJR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SJR/10100SJ0040.htm |