IL SJR0046 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-01 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-01 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
RESOLVED, BY THE SENATE OF THE ONE HUNDRED FIRST GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the Senate adjourns on Saturday, June 01, 2019, it stands adjourned until Monday, October 28, 2019, or until the call of the President; and when the House of Representatives adjourns on Saturday, June 01, 2019, it stands adjourned until Thursday, October 17, 2019, in perfunctory session, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Monday, October 28, 2019, or until the call of the Speaker.
Title
ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-06-01 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-06-01 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Prevailed to Suspend Rule 3-6(a) |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Moved to Suspend Rule Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford; 3-6(a) |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=46&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SJR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SJR/10100SJ0046.htm |