IL SJRCA0004 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes to amend the Legislature Article of the Illinois Constitution. Removes the requirement for each Legislative District to be divided into two Representative Districts. Modifies provisions concerning legislative redistricting. Provides specified requirements for each Legislative District, Representative District, and Congressional District for redistricting purposes. Replaces the current method of legislative redistricting with the following: a sixteen-member commission, appointed by the Chief Justice of the Supreme Court and the most senior Supreme Court Justice of a different political party in accordance with specified criteria, shall adopt and file with the Secretary of State redistricting plans for Legislative, Representative, and Congressional Districts following a series of public hearings by August 1 of the year following a federal decennial census; permits the public to submit maps during the map drawing process for consideration by the Commission; and, if a redistricting plan is not adopted by August 1 of the year following a federal decennial census, then a seventeenth member shall be appointed to the Commission and redistricting plans shall be filed by September 1. Adds provisions concerning the membership of the Commission and budgetary matters related to the Commission. Effective upon being declared adopted and applicable to redistricting beginning in 2021 and to the election of General Assembly members beginning in 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CON AMEND-REDISTRICTING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-02-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-01-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-01-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-01-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2019-01-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2019-01-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-01-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-01-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2019-01-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2019-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback