IL SJRCA0008 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Legislature and Finance Articles of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that members of the General Assembly shall not receive a salary or allowances if the General Assembly fails to make appropriations for the State budget. Provides that the first bill to become law in a given year shall be a bill making State budget appropriations for an ensuing fiscal year. Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
CON AMEND-COMPENSATION-BUDGET
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=8&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SJRCA&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SJRCA/10100SC0008.htm |