IL SJRCA0012 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Legislature and Revenue Articles of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that the General Assembly may increase the rate of an existing tax or impose a new tax only by a law approved by the vote of two-thirds of the members elected to each house. Provides that the General Assembly may override the veto of the Governor of a bill to increase the rate of an existing tax or impose a new tax only by a record vote of two-thirds of the members elected to each house. Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
CON AMEND-TAX-2/3RDS VOTE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=12&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SJRCA&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SJRCA/10100SC0012.htm |