IL SR0052 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the first Wednesday in May as Disabled Peace Officers Recognition Day in the State of Illinois.
Title
DISABLED PEACE OFFICERS DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Millner |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. M. Maggie Crotty |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 14, 2011 |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Be Adopted State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000 |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=52&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SR/09700SR0052.htm |