IL SR0052 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the third Saturday of August in 2015 as "Spirit of '45 Day" in the State of Illinois to commemorate the anniversary of the end of World War II on August 14, 1945.
Title
SPIRIT OF '45 DAY
Sponsors
Sen. John Mulroe [D] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Michael Hastings [D] | Sen. Linda Holmes [D] |
Sen. Kwame Raoul [D] | Sen. Dan Kotowski [D] | Sen. Steven Landek [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 3, 2015 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Be Adopted State Government and Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=52&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SR/09900SR0052.htm |