IL SR0052 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supports the Nutrient Loss Reduction Strategy and the work of stakeholders on the continued implementation of the Strategy.
Title
NUTRIENT LOSS REDUCTION
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Bennett [D] | Sen. Andy Manar [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] |
Sen. Paul Schimpf [R] | Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] | Sen. Dale Righter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Be Adopted Environment and Conservation; 008-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=52&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SR/10100SR0052.htm |