IL SR0062 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares April 2019 as Sexual Assault Awareness Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SEXUAL ASSAULT AWARENESS MONTH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2019-04-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-04-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-02-21SenateResolution Adopted
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateBe Adopted Public Health; 012-000-000
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-02-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak
2019-02-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2019-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-02-06SenateAssigned to Public Health
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback