IL SR0063 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the General Assembly to continue to investigate and identify areas in which the State can improve with respect to the prevention of maternal mortality, especially among vulnerable populations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INVESTIGATE MATERNAL MORTALITY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateResolution Adopted
2019-04-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Hutchinson
2019-04-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hutchinson
2019-04-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 008-000-000
2019-03-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 008-000-000
2019-03-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-03-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Public Health
2019-03-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health
2019-03-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2019-03-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2019-03-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-03-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateBe Adopted Public Health; 010-002-000
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-02-06SenateAssigned to Public Health
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback