IL SR0079 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares June 10, 2019 as 19th Amendment Ratification Day in the State of Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

19TH AMENDMNT RATIFICATION DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateResolution Adopted
2019-03-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 5, 2019
2019-02-21SenateBe Adopted State Government; 008-000-000
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-05SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback