IL SR0083 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares April 2, 2019 as Pay Equity Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PAY EQUITY DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2019-04-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-04-03SenateResolution Adopted
2019-04-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateBe Adopted Labor; 016-000-000
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Labor
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback