IL SR0088 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the Illinois Department of Public Health to adopt new guidelines for painkillers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DPH-PAINKILLER GUIDELINES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12SenateResolution Adopted
2019-04-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-04-03SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 13, 2019
2019-03-12SenateBe Adopted Public Health; 009-000-000
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-02-20SenatePostponed - Public Health
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Public Health
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback