IL SR0128 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
States that Illinois Breast and Cervical Cancer Program eligibility and funding should be broadened to further reduce barriers to breast screening, detection and treatment for underserved women to improve conditions for women to achieve optimal health, regardless of their race, ethnicity, or economic status.
Title
BREAST CANCER PROGRAM FUNDING
Sponsors
Sen. Rachelle Crowe [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] |
Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Steven Landek [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Be Adopted Public Health; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=128&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SR/10100SR0128.htm |