IL SR0193 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares the African Methodist Episcopal (AME) Day at the Capitol on March 27, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AME DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateResolution Adopted
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateBe Adopted State Government; 007-000-000
2019-03-12SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-03-05SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-03-05SenateChief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-05SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback