IL SR0199 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares April 3, 2019 "Easterseals Day" in the State of Illinois.
Title
EASTERSEALS DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Be Adopted Public Health; 012-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=199&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SR/10100SR0199.htm |