IL SR0201 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Encourages Illinois residents to visit cancerscreenweek.org for cancer screening resources and talk to their healthcare providers about their risk factors for all cancer types. Declares the first week of December 2019 as "Cancer Screen Week". Urges the Illinois General Assembly to take actions to evaluate current levels of funding for cancer screening in state medical assistance, public health, or standalone programs to ensure adequate funding is available for cancer screening and/or treatment services. Urges the Illinois General Assembly to identify and advance policies to increase rates of cancer screening and improve cancer screening awareness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CANCER SCREEN WEEK

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12SenateResolution Adopted
2019-04-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-04-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-03-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 28, 2019
2019-03-27SenateBe Adopted Public Health; 008-000-000
2019-03-19SenateAssigned to Public Health
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-03-07SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback