IL SR0216 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares March 2019 as Problem Gambling Awareness Month in the State of Illinois.
Title
PROB GAMBLING AWARENESS MNTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Be Adopted Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=216&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SR/10100SR0216.htm |