IL SR0224 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supports Northwestern Pritzker School of Law, John Marshall Law School, Northern Illinois University College of Law, University of Chicago Law School, Southern Illinois University School of Law, Chicago-Kent College of Law, DePaul University College of Law, Loyola University Chicago School of Law, and University of Illinois College of Law and their presidents' efforts to recognize and better address mental health issues among lawyers, starting with law students.
Title
SUPPORT IL LAW SCHOOLS
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions April 9, 2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Be Adopted Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=224&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SR/10100SR0224.htm |