IL SR0251 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-13 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-13 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares Mahatma Gandhi's birthday, October 2, 2019, as the State Day of Peace to Non-Violence in the State of Illinois.
Title
DAY OF PEACE TO NON-VIOLENCE
Sponsors
Sen. Ram Villivalam [D] | Sen. Laura Ellman [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] |
Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-13 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions November 13, 2019 |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Be Adopted State Government; 007-000-000 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=251&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SR/10100SR0251.htm |