IL SR0298 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Supports the efforts of the student bar associations of Northwestern Pritzker School of Law, John Marshall Law School, Northern Illinois University College of Law, University of Chicago Law School, Southern Illinois University School of Law, Chicago-Kent College of Law, DePaul University College of Law, Loyola University Chicago School of Law, and University of Illinois College of Law to recognize and better address mental health issues among lawyers, starting with law students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SUPPORT IL LAW SCHOOLS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-04-12SenateResolution Adopted
2019-04-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions
2019-04-04SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-03SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback