IL SR0299 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages all school districts in Illinois to adopt a Know Me, Know My Name plan to identify disconnected youth in their schools and start on a path to build relationships with those children that leads away from violence and toward compassion and belonging.
Title
KNOW ME, KNOW MY NAME PLAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Be Adopted Education; 011-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=299&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SR/10100SR0299.htm |