IL SR0301 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Endorses and encourages the use of the Illinois Snapshot of Early Literacy by Illinois schools and by the additional 21 states within the Partnership for Assessment of Readiness for College and Careers consortium.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EARLY LITERACY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-30SenateResolution Adopted
2013-05-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 29, 2013
2013-05-28SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2013-05-28SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2013-05-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2013-05-21SenateAssigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
2013-05-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2013-05-09SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback