IL SR0351 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares the date of May 8, 2019 as Alpha Kappa Alpha Day in the State of Illinois in honor of Alpha Kappa Alpha Sorority, Incorporated, and its work.
Title
ALPHA KAPPA ALPHA DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Be Adopted State Government; 005-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=351&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SR/10100SR0351.htm |