IL SR0372 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares May 2019 as "Brain Tumor Awareness Month" in the State of Illinois and urges increased funding and research.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BRAIN TUMOR AWARENESS MONTH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-05-24SenateResolution Adopted
2019-05-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-05-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 16, 2019
2019-05-15SenateBe Adopted Public Health; 009-000-000
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-05-08SenateAssigned to Public Health
2019-05-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-05-07SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback