IL SR0403 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Resolution Adopted; 039-011-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Resolution Adopted; 039-011-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Auditor General to conduct a performance audit of the Department of Children and Family Services' compliance with its obligations to protect and affirm children and youth who are lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender, questioning, or queer.
Title
AUDIT-DCFS/LGBTQ
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 039-011-000 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 29, 2019 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Be Adopted Human Services; 006-002-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |