IL SR0419 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the State of Illinois to play an important role in addressing climate change.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ILLINOIS-CLIMATE CHANGE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2019-07-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2019-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Environment and Conservation
2019-05-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2019-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak
2019-05-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-05-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 24, 2019
2019-05-23SenateBe Adopted Environment and Conservation; 006-001-000
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-05-16SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-05-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-05-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-05-15SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback