IL SR0426 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares June 7, 2019 as "Medal of Honor Day" and honors those who received the Medal of Honor.
Title
MEDAL OF HONOR DAY
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] | Sen. Paul Schimpf [R] | Sen. Jil Tracy [R] | Sen. Neil Anderson [R] |
Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Rachelle Crowe [D] | Sen. Michael Hastings [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Be Adopted State Government; 005-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=426&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SR/10100SR0426.htm |