IL SR0432 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares June 7, 2019 as "Gun Violence Awareness Day".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GUN VIOLENCE AWARENESS DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31SenateResolution Adopted
2019-05-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-05-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 30, 2019
2019-05-29SenateBe Adopted State Government; 005-000-000
2019-05-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-05-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-05-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-05-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-05-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-05-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-05-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak
2019-05-23SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-05-21SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-05-21SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback