IL SR0451 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-14 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-14 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges all four caucuses and the Governor to consider the Kaskaskia Watershed Comprehensive Plan when creating the upcoming fiscal year budget.
Title
KASKASKIA WATERSHED PLAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions November 14, 2019 |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Be Adopted State Government; 007-000-000 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=451&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SR/10100SR0451.htm |