IL SR0992 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the U.S. Congress to expand the Public Service Loan Forgiveness Program so that it includes farming as an applicable career for loan forgiveness.
Title
LOAN FORGIVENESS-FARMING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 3, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Be Adopted Agriculture; 010-000-000 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=992&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SR/10100SR0992.htm |