IN HB1001 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-15 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
Pending: Senate Education and Career Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

School accountability. Provides that a school's or school corporation's category or designation of school or school corporation performance assigned by the state board of education for the 2018-2019 school year may not be lower than the school's or school corporation's category or designation of school or school corporation performance for the 2017-2018 school year. Provides that a school's or school corporation's category or designation of school or school corporation performance assigned by the state board of education for the 2019-2020 school year is the higher of the school's or school corporation's: (1) category or designation of school or school corporation performance assigned for the 2018-2019 school year; or (2) category or designation of school or school corporation performance for the 2019-2020 school year. Provides that consequences for school improvement do not apply for the 2018-2019 or 2019-2020 school years. Provides that ILEARN program test scores or a school's category or designation of school improvement for the 2018-2019 or 2019-2020 school year may not be used by a school corporation as part of an annual performance evaluation of a particular certificated employee unless the use of the ILEARN program test scores or a school's category or designation of school improvement would improve the particular certificated employee's annual performance rating.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School accountability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-13 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-07 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-15SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2020-01-14HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-13HouseCosponsor: Senator Rogers
2020-01-13HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Raatz, Bray, Kruse
2020-01-13HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 16: yeas 100, nays 0
2020-01-09HouseRepresentatives Kirchhofer and Smith, V. added as coauthors
2020-01-09HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-07HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2020-01-06HouseCoauthored by Representative Carbaugh
2020-01-06HouseAuthored by Representative DeVon

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback