IN HB1004 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Public Law 197
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

School safety. Provides that the Indiana safe schools fund may not be used to provide grants to employ a school resource officer or a law enforcement officer. Provides that an Indiana secured school fund matching grant may be used to employ a law enforcement officer. Provides that an accredited nonpublic school may receive a grant from the Indiana secured school fund (fund). Makes changes to the maximum grant amounts that a school corporation, charter school, accredited nonpublic school, or coalition of schools may receive from the fund. Provides that a virtual charter school or a virtual accredited nonpublic school may not receive a grant from the fund. Establishes minimum grant match percentages necessary to be eligible to receive a grant from the fund. Provides that, before July 1, 2021, each school corporation, charter school, or accredited nonpublic school shall certify to the department of homeland security that the school corporation, charter school, or accredited nonpublic school has conducted a threat assessment for each school building used by the school corporation, charter school, or accredited nonpublic school before applying for a fund matching grant. Requires that at least one of the manmade disaster drills that is required to be conducted by each school in a school corporation during each semester must be an active shooter drill and must be conducted within 90 days after the beginning of the school year. Provides that each: (1) accredited nonpublic school; and (2) charter school; must conduct at least one active shooter drill during each school year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School safety. Provides that the Indiana safe schools fund may not be used to provide grants to employ a school resource officer or a law enforcement officer. Provides that an Indiana secured school fund matching grant may be used to employ a law enforcement officer. Provides that an accredited nonpublic school may receive a grant from the Indiana secured school fund (fund). Makes changes to the maximum grant amounts that a school corporation, charter school, accredited nonpublic school, or coalition of schools may receive from the fund. Provides that a virtual charter school or a virtual accredited nonpublic school may not receive a grant from the fund. Establishes minimum grant match percentages necessary to be eligible to receive a grant from the fund. Provides that, before July 1, 2021, each school corporation, charter school, or accredited nonpublic school shall certify to the department of homeland security that the school corporation, charter school, or accredited nonpublic school has conducted a threat assessment for each school building used by the school corporation, charter school, or accredited nonpublic school before applying for a fund matching grant. Requires that at least one of the manmade disaster drills that is required to be conducted by each school in a school corporation during each semester must be an active shooter drill and must be conducted within 90 days after the beginning of the school year. Provides that each: (1) accredited nonpublic school; and (2) charter school; must conduct at least one active shooter drill during each school year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - Amendment #6 (Pfaff) prevailed (Y: 83 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HousePublic Law 197
2019-05-02HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-24HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-23SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 575: yeas 46, nays 2
2019-04-23HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 598: yeas 93, nays 1
2019-04-23SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2019-04-23HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2019-04-15SenateSenate advisors appointed: Crider and Melton
2019-04-15SenateSenate conferees appointed: Raatz and Stoops
2019-04-15HouseHouse advisors appointed: Cook, Mahan, Macer and Pfaff
2019-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: McNamara and Wright
2019-04-15HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2019-04-15HouseMotion to dissent filed
2019-04-12SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-11SenateSenator Kruse added as cosponsor
2019-04-11SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 436: yeas 31, nays 17
2019-04-09SenateAmendment #2 (Freeman) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-09SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-04-08SenateCommittee report: without recommendation, adopted
2019-04-08SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
2019-04-04SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-25SenateSenator Melton added as cosponsor
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2019-01-29HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-01-28HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Raatz and Crider
2019-01-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 43: yeas 96, nays 2
2019-01-24HouseAmendment #7 (Pfaff) motion withdrawn
2019-01-24HouseAmendment #6 (Pfaff) prevailed; Roll Call 29: yeas 83, nays 15
2019-01-24HouseAmendment #11 (Lehman) prevailed; voice vote
2019-01-24HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-01-17HouseRepresentative Wright added as coauthor
2019-01-16HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-14HouseRepresentatives Cook and Mahan added as coauthors
2019-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2019-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative McNamara

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1004/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/c/8/e0c85df3/HB1004.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/8/6/db867d5a/HB1004.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/5/6/37561d5f/HB1004.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/3/7/8/3378e33a/HB1004.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/9/b/a49b57e9/HB1004.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/4/6/a546003b/HB1004.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/0/5/d/a05d6a57/HB1004.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/a/7/62a7937f/HB1004.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/7/6/e/676ed08e/HB1004.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/4/2/1942a6c1/HB1004.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/c/3/62c34618/HB1004.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/1/6/9/91694542/HB1004.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/7/2/28727a59/HB1004.29.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/0/0/4800108b/HB1004.43.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/8/f/a/e8fa914b/HB1004.03.ENGH.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/d/c/b7dcc95f/HB1004.436.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/7/c/e67c4974/HB1004.575.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/0/f/6/c0f6bab2/HB1004.598.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback