IN HB1007 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Public Law 292
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Public Law 292
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Perinatal care. Requires the state department of health (department) to establish a perinatal navigator program. Requires a health care provider to: (1) use a validated and evidence based verbal screening tool to assess a substance use disorder in pregnancy for all pregnant women who are seen by the health care provider; and (2) if the health care provider identifies a pregnant woman who has a substance use disorder and is not currently receiving treatment, provide treatment or refer the patient to treatment. Requires the department to establish guidelines for health care providers treating substance use disorder in pregnancy. Adds the
Title
Perinatal care. Requires the state department of health (department) to establish a perinatal navigator program. Requires a health care provider to: (1) use a validated and evidence based verbal screening tool to assess a substance use disorder in pregnancy for all pregnant women who are seen by the health care provider; and (2) if the health care provider identifies a pregnant woman who has a substance use disorder and is not currently receiving treatment, provide treatment or refer the patient to treatment. Requires the department to establish guidelines for health care providers treating substance use disorder in pregnancy. Adds the
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - Third reading (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - Third reading (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Public Law 292 |
2019-05-08 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as cosponsor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 418: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as cosponsor |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-01-24 | House | Representatives DeVon and Bacon added as coauthors |
2019-01-24 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2019-01-24 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Charbonneau and Crider |
2019-01-24 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 31: yeas 99, nays 0 |
2019-01-22 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-01-17 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-14 | House | Representative Shackleford added as coauthor |
2019-01-10 | House | Representative McNamara added as coauthor |
2019-01-10 | House | Representative Sullivan added as coauthor |
2019-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2019-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Kirchhofer |