IN HB1015 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - SECTIONS 7 through 11 effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - SECTIONS 7 through 11 effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the law concerning financial requirements that apply to limited purpose subsidiary life insurance companies, including: the definition of "parent"; filings with and reports to the commissioner of insurance; and valuation of admitted assets. Specifies qualifications and educational requirements for solicitation, negotiation, and sale of annuities. Makes changes to limitations on long term care insurance commission amounts.
Title
Insurance matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 68 N: 7 NV: 18 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 68 N: 7 NV: 18 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | SECTIONS 7 through 11 effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | SECTIONS 1 through 6 effective 05/09/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 115 | |
2011-05-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-04 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-29 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-29 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-29 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 494: yeas 49, nays 0 | |
2011-04-28 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 699: yeas 68, nays 7 | |
2011-04-28 | Rules suspended | |
2011-04-28 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2011-04-25 | Senate advisors appointed: Holdman and Mrvan | |
2011-04-25 | Senate conferees appointed: Paul and Simpson | |
2011-04-25 | House advisors appointed: Lehman, Kirchhofer and C. Fry | |
2011-04-25 | House conferees appointed: Torr and C. Brown | |
2011-04-21 | House dissented from Senate amendments | |
2011-04-07 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2011-04-07 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 309: yeas 49 and nays 0 | |
2011-04-04 | Amendment 10 (Holdman), prevailed; | |
2011-04-04 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-03-24 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-02-17 | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions | |
2011-01-25 | Senate sponsors: Senators Paul and Simpson | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-01-25 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 23: yeas 86, nays 2 | |
2011-01-24 | Representatives Frizzell and C. Brown added as coauthors | |
2011-01-24 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-01-20 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-12 | Representative Noe added as coauthor | |
2011-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance | |
2011-01-05 | Authored by Representative Torr |