IN HB1015 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Public Law 93
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Public Law 93
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Benefit corporations. Allows a business entity to incorporate as a benefit corporation under Indiana law.
Title
Benefit corporations. Allows a business entity to incorporate as a benefit corporation under Indiana law.
Sponsors
Rep. Casey Cox [R] | Rep. Edward DeLaney [D] | Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] | Rep. Ryan Dvorak [D] |
Sen. James Merritt [R] | Sen. Randall Head [R] | Sen. John Broden [D] | Sen. Jean Breaux [D] |
Sen. Michael Delph [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | House | Public Law 93 |
2015-04-30 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-21 | House | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senator Delph added as cosponsor |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as cosponsor |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 414: yeas 49, nays 1 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-03-02 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to committee on Civil Law |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-24 | House | Senator Broden added as third sponsor |
2015-02-24 | House | Senator Head added as second sponsor |
2015-02-24 | House | Senator Merritt added as sponsor |
2015-02-24 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 231: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2015-02-23 | House | Amendment #1 (Cox) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-23 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-17 | House | Representatives Steuerwald and Dvorak added as coauthor |
2015-02-10 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-20 | House | Representative DeLaney added as coauthor |
2015-01-06 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative Cox |