IN HB1022 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 151
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 151
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Panhandling. Provides that a person who panhandles within 50 feet of: (1) the entrance or exit to a bank, business, or restaurant; (2) the location where a financial transaction occurs; or (3) a public monument; commits the offense of panhandling, a Class C misdemeanor. Provides that a person who knowingly or intentionally panhandles regardless of the time of day commits panhandling, a Class C misdemeanor. (Current law limits the time period of the offense to after sunset and before sunrise.) Defines "financial transaction" and "public monument".
Title
Panhandling.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Bosma [R] | Rep. Gerald Torr [R] | Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Elizabeth Brown [R] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 84 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 84 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Public Law 151 |
2020-03-21 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 367: yeas 35, nays 14 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 359: yeas 84, nays 10 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senator Brown L added as conferee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senator Randolph Lonnie M removed as conferee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senator Brown L removed as advisor |
2020-03-10 | House | Representative Torr added as conferee |
2020-03-10 | House | Representative Porter removed as conferee |
2020-03-10 | House | Representative Torr removed as advisor |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Brown L and Taylor G |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Messmer and Randolph Lonnie M |
2020-03-05 | House | Representative Torr added as coauthor |
2020-03-04 | House | House advisors appointed: Huston, Torr and Dvorak |
2020-03-04 | House | House conferees appointed: Bosma and Porter |
2020-03-04 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2020-03-04 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2020-03-04 | House | Representative Porter removed as coauthor |
2020-03-04 | House | Representative Bosma added as author |
2020-03-04 | House | Representative Torr removed as author |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 215: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senator Brown L added as second sponsor |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Brown L) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-02-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-23 | House | Representative Porter added as coauthor |
2020-01-22 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-01-21 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Messmer |
2020-01-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 31: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2020-01-16 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-13 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative Torr |