IN HB1027 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Township assessors. Abolishes the office of township assessor, effective January 1, 2023. Transfers the duties of the township assessor to the county assessor of the county in which the township is located. Provides that if the office of township assessor becomes vacant before January 1, 2023, the office is abolished and the duties of the township assessor are transferred to the county assessor.
Title
Township assessors.
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Engleman [R] | Rep. Jim Pressel [R] | Rep. Ryan Lauer [R] | Rep. Carolyn Jackson [D] |
Sen. Eric Bassler [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Campbell) failed (Y: 38 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-01-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Campbell) failed (Y: 38 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-01-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-01-14 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Bassler |
2020-01-14 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 22: yeas 53, nays 44 |
2020-01-13 | House | Amendment #1 (Campbell) failed; Roll Call 19: yeas 38, nays 59 |
2020-01-13 | House | Amendment #3 (Moseley) failed; voice vote |
2020-01-13 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-09 | House | Representatives Lauer and Jackson added as coauthors |
2020-01-09 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2020-01-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative Pressel |
2020-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative Engleman |