IN HB1032 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 95
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 95
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Interfering with public safety. Renames the offense of "interfering with law enforcement" to "interfering with public safety", and provides that a person who enters a marked off area after having been denied entry by an emergency medical services provider commits interfering with public safety. (Under current law, the offense is only committed if the person is denied entry by a law enforcement officer.)
Title
Interfering with public safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Public Law 95 |
2020-03-18 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-04 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 300: yeas 88, nays 3 |
2020-03-03 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as cosponsor |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senators Young M and Doriot added as cosponsors |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 236: yeas 43, nays 4 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Young M) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senator Koch added as cosponsor |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-02-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2020-01-22 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-01-21 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Rogers and Crider |
2020-01-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 32: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2020-01-16 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-14 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-09 | House | Representative Macer added as coauthor |
2020-01-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety |
2020-01-06 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Frye R and Bartels |
2020-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative Miller D |