IN HB1054 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
Pending: Senate Pensions and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
Pending: Senate Pensions and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Professional employer organizations. Provides that for purposes of unemployment compensation, a professional employer organization (PEO) that elects to use the PEO level reporting method is liable for all contributions, interest, penalties, and surcharges for the duration of a professional employer agreement or until the effective date of an election by the PEO to change to the client level reporting method. Provides that a client of a PEO is not considered to be a successor employer as a result of entering into a professional employer agreement with a PEO.
Title
Professional employer organizations. Provides that for purposes of unemployment compensation, a professional employer organization (PEO) that elects to use the PEO level reporting method is liable for all contributions, interest, penalties, and surcharges for the duration of a professional employer agreement or until the effective date of an election by the PEO to change to the client level reporting method. Provides that a client of a PEO is not considered to be a successor employer as a result of entering into a professional employer agreement with a PEO.
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald Torr [R] | Rep. Doug Miller [R] | Rep. Ross Deal [D] | Sen. Philip Boots [R] |
Sen. David Niezgodski [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-14 - House - Third reading (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2019-01-16 | House | Representative Moseley added as coauthor |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-01-14 | House | Representatives Miller and Deal added as coauthors |
2019-01-14 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Boots and Niezgodski |
2019-01-14 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 7: yeas 99, nays 0 |
2019-01-10 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-01-08 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-03 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2019-01-03 | House | Authored by Representative Torr |