IN HB1059 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 98
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 98
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sales tax on recreational vehicles. Provides that for certain transactions involving a cargo trailer or recreational vehicle, the state gross retail tax rate is the rate of the nonreciprocal state or foreign country (excluding any locally imposed tax rates) in which the cargo trailer or recreational vehicle will be titled or registered, as certified by the seller and purchaser in an affidavit prescribed by the department of state revenue (department). Provides what information must be included in the affidavit prescribed by the department. Provides that the department shall create a certificate of sales tax paid form for a cargo trailer or recreational vehicle that may be completed by the dealer and provided to the purchaser of a cargo trailer or recreational vehicle sold in Indiana. Provides that the department may audit submitted affidavits and make a proposed assessment of the amount of unpaid tax due with respect to any incorrect information.
Title
Sales tax on recreational vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Miller [R] | Rep. Robert Cherry [R] | Rep. Jack Jordan [R] | Rep. Christy Stutzman [R] |
Sen. Blake Doriot [R] | Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] |
Sen. David Niezgodski [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 70 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Macer) failed (Y: 41 N: 51 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-01-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 70 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Macer) failed (Y: 41 N: 51 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-01-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Public Law 98 |
2020-03-18 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 329: yeas 62, nays 8 |
2020-03-05 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 280: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as cosponsor |
2020-02-11 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-01-27 | House | Representative Stutzman added as coauthor |
2020-01-27 | House | Cosponsor: Senator Buck |
2020-01-27 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Doriot, Messmer, Rogers |
2020-01-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 71: yeas 70, nays 24 |
2020-01-23 | House | Representative Jordan added as coauthor |
2020-01-23 | House | Amendment #3 (Macer) failed; Roll Call 40: yeas 41, nays 51 |
2020-01-23 | House | Amendment #2 (Porter) ruled out of order |
2020-01-23 | House | Amendment #1 (Porter) failed; voice vote |
2020-01-23 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-21 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-09 | House | Representative Cherry added as coauthor |
2020-01-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative Miller D |