IN HB1081 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commission for supplier diversity. Changes the name of the governor's commission on minority and women's business enterprises to the governor's commission on supplier diversity (commission). Relocates provisions concerning small businesses owned and operated by Indiana veterans to the commission's statutes. Makes conforming changes.
Title
Commission for supplier diversity.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Gutwein [R] | Rep. Sharon Negele [R] | Rep. Earl Harris [D] | Sen. Erin Houchin [R] |
Sen. Chris Garten [R] | Sen. Jean Breaux [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Public Law 15 |
2020-03-11 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senator Garten added as second sponsor |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 238: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as cosponsor |
2020-02-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-01-28 | House | Representative Harris added as coauthor |
2020-01-28 | House | Senator Houchin added as sponsor |
2020-01-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 79: yeas 98, nays 0 |
2020-01-27 | House | Amendment #1 (Bartlett) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-01-27 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-01-23 | House | Representative Negele added as coauthor |
2020-01-23 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2020-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Gutwein |