IN HB1089 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 241
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Education matters. Provides that a school corporation shall accept a transferring student who does not have legal settlement in the school corporation and who has a parent who is a current employee of the transferee school corporation with an annual salary of at least $8,000. (Under current law, a school corporation shall accept a transferring student who does not have legal settlement in the school corporation and who has a parent who is a current employee of the transferee school corporation.) Provides that each school corporation and charter school shall require certain applicants for employment and school employees to attend training concerning recognition of the signs and symptoms of seizures and the appropriate steps to be taken to respond to these symptoms. Provides that, if a school corporation or charter school receives a seizure management and treatment plan for a student that was developed by the student's health care provider, certain requirements must be met by the school corporation or charter school and the school nurse or school nurse's designee. Requires the department of education to identify resources to assist public schools in implementing individual health plans for students with seizure disorders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education matters. Provides that a school corporation shall accept a transferring student who does not have legal settlement in the school corporation and who has a parent who is a current employee of the transferee school corporation with an annual salary of at least $8,000. (Under current law, a school corporation shall accept a transferring student who does not have legal settlement in the school corporation and who has a parent who is a current employee of the transferee school corporation.) Provides that each school corporation and charter school shall require certain applicants for employment and school employees to attend training concerning recognition of the signs and symptoms of seizures and the appropriate steps to be taken to respond to these symptoms. Provides that, if a school corporation or charter school receives a seizure management and treatment plan for a student that was developed by the student's health care provider, certain requirements must be met by the school corporation or charter school and the school nurse or school nurse's designee. Requires the department of education to identify resources to assist public schools in implementing individual health plans for students with seizure disorders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - Amendment #1 (Pfaff) prevailed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-05HousePublic Law 241
2019-05-05HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-24HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-23SenateConference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 564: yeas 48, nays 1
2019-04-23HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 588: yeas 88, nays 0
2019-04-22SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2019-04-22HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2019-04-17HouseHouse advisors appointed: Cook, DeVon, DeLaney and Klinker
2019-04-17HouseHouse conferees appointed: Thompson and Pfaff
2019-04-16SenateSenate advisors appointed: Kruse and Melton
2019-04-16SenateSenate conferees appointed: Raatz and Stoops
2019-04-16HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2019-04-16HouseMotion to dissent filed
2019-04-09SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-08SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 397: yeas 48, nays 1
2019-04-04SenateAmendment #2 (Raatz) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-04SenateAmendment #1 (Raatz) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-04SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-03-26SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-03-21SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-14SenateSenator Kruse added as second sponsor
2019-03-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2019-02-22HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-21HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Raatz
2019-02-21HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 253: yeas 98, nays 0
2019-02-20HouseAmendment #1 (Pfaff) prevailed; Roll Call 243: yeas 94, nays 0
2019-02-20HouseAmendment #2 (Thompson) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-20HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-02-18HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-03HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2019-01-03HouseAuthored by Representative Thompson

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1089/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/b/2/4/3b240502/HB1089.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/4/0/6/b406535c/HB1089.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/4/c/8/24c86755/HB1089.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/7/b/d/97bdf042/HB1089.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/e/6/1/6e61612a/HB1089.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/d/8/d/8d8d9b64/HB1089.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/f/c/98fcb655/HB1089.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/d/5/eed5bb44/HB1089.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/9/7/e6973d07/HB1089.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/2/2/2b22a33a/HB1089.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/d/1/3fd1717a/HB1089.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/c/b/cdcb85a1/HB1089.01.INTR.06.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/7/a/f/c7afe160/HB1089.243.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/4/f/544f830a/HB1089.253.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/4/3/c/c43cc478/HB1089.03.ENGH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/b/7/0/5b70cae4/HB1089.397.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/c/9/7/5c97a15d/HB1089.588.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/1/5/8/21582c55/HB1089.564.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback