IN HB1092 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 103
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 103
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Medicaid plan amendments. Requires, by July 1, 2020, the office of the secretary of family and social services to amend the state Medicaid plan to include certain reimbursements and implementation of supervision by specified providers of patient's plan of treatment for outpatient mental health or substance abuse treatment services. Requires an insurer that issues a policy of accident and sickness insurance or a health maintenance organization contract that provides coverage of services for treatment of a mental illness or substance abuse to annually submit a report and analysis to the department of insurance (department) that includes certain information demonstrating its compliance with federal laws regarding parity in coverage of services for treatment of a mental illness or substance abuse and coverage of services for treatment of other medical or surgical conditions, including the processes used: (1) to develop medical necessity criteria for coverage of services; and (2) to develop and apply nonquantitative treatment limitations. Extends a prohibition concerning risk based managed care programs and capitated managed care programs from June 30, 2020, to June 30, 2021.
Title
State Medicaid plan amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Public Law 103 |
2020-03-18 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 368: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 360: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Ruckelshaus and Mrvan |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Charbonneau and Breaux |
2020-03-05 | House | House advisors appointed: Kirchhofer, Karickhoff and Shackleford |
2020-03-05 | House | House conferees appointed: Ziemke and Fleming |
2020-03-05 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2020-03-05 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 210: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senator Crider added as second sponsor |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-02-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-01-28 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Charbonneau |
2020-01-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 81: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2020-01-27 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-23 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2020-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Ziemke |