IN HB1111 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - Senator Lanane added as third sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - Senator Lanane added as third sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a 3% price preference for businesses owned by veterans for purposes of state public works contracts, state purchasing of goods and services, and state highway contracts. Makes changes to the definition of "armed forces" to include the service of certain merchant marines for matters relating to the bureau of motor vehicles. Authorizes the Indiana department of veterans' affairs to aid and assist certain merchant marines entitled to benefits by the United States, the state, or another state or government. Authorizes the Indiana veterans' home to admit as members: (1) certain individuals who served in the merchant marine; or (2) the spouse or surviving spouse of certain individuals who served in the merchant marine.
Title
Veteran matters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-15 | Senator Lanane added as third sponsor | |
2010-02-15 | Senator Head added as second sponsor | |
2010-02-15 | Senator Delph added as first sponsor | |
2010-02-15 | Senator Lanane removed as first sponsor | |
2010-02-09 | Senators Deig, Hume and Errington added as cosponsors | |
2010-02-09 | Senator Arnold added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure | |
2010-01-21 | Senate sponsor: Senator Lanane | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to the Senate | |
2010-01-21 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 41: Yeas 97, Nays 0 | |
2010-01-14 | Amendment 3 (Wolkins), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-01-14 | Amendment 2 (Ruppel), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-01-14 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-12 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-12 | Representatives Ruppel, Herrell and Reske added as coauthors | |
2010-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety | |
2010-01-05 | Authored by Representative Barnes |