IN HB1112 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Skills enhancement fund grants. Provides that an increase of wages with a participating employee or group of participating employees negotiated by agreement, regardless of timing, qualifies as an increase of wages for purposes of eligibility for a grant from the skills enhancement fund for a participating employee that is an existing worker.
Title
Skills enhancement fund grants.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Leonard [R] | Rep. Charles Moseley [D] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Travis Holdman [R] |
Sen. Philip Boots [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Public Law 18 |
2020-03-11 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 242: yeas 44, nays 0 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as cosponsor |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senator Boots added as third sponsor |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-02-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-02-03 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Koch and Holdman |
2020-02-03 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 156: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2020-01-30 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-28 | House | Representative Moseley added as coauthor |
2020-01-28 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2020-01-08 | House | Authored by Representative Leonard |