IN HB1118 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Public Law 48
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Public Law 48
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Howard County magistrate. Allows the judges of the Howard circuit and superior courts to jointly appoint a magistrate to serve the Howard County courts.
Title
Howard County magistrate. Allows the judges of the Howard circuit and superior courts to jointly appoint a magistrate to serve the Howard County courts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Public Law 48 |
2019-04-18 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 349: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-02-12 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Buck and Head |
2019-02-12 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 167: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2019-02-11 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2019-01-10 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2019-01-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative VanNatter |
2019-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Karickhoff |