IN HB1120 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 106
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 106
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Community corrections and credit time. Amends guidelines related to educational credit time for a person incarcerated in the department of correction. Provides that, before May 1, 2023, the department of correction shall submit a report to the legislative council concerning the implementation of the individualized case management plan. Permits a prosecuting attorney to file for revocation of a community corrections placement. Provides that credit time earned by a person on pretrial home detention does not include accrued time.
Title
Community corrections and credit time.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] | Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] | Rep. Randall Frye [R] | Rep. Matt Pierce [D] |
Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Mike Gaskill [R] | Sen. Greg Taylor [D] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Public Law 106 |
2020-03-18 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 338: yeas 88, nays 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 288: yeas 49, nays 1 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Sandlin) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-02-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2020-01-24 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-01-23 | House | Cosponsor: Senator Taylor G |
2020-01-23 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Koch, Young M, Gaskill |
2020-01-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 48: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2020-01-21 | House | Representatives Frye and Pierce added as coauthors |
2020-01-21 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-16 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-09 | House | Representative McNamara added as coauthor |
2020-01-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2020-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative Steuerwald |