IN HB1130 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Public Law 180
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Public Law 180
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Professional licensing agency matters. Allows a person who is enrolled in an architecture degree program to take the architect registration examination. Provides that the dietitians certification board is required to hold one regular meeting each year. (Current law requires two meetings.) Removes and repeals provisions concerning the application for and administration of the dietitian certification examination. Allows an individual to fit and dispense hearing aids while under the supervision and direction of a certified hearing aid dealer. Provides that certain duties of the medical licensing board are now duties of the committee of hearing aid dealer examiners. Requires that a
Title
Professional licensing agency matters. Allows a person who is enrolled in an architecture degree program to take the architect registration examination. Provides that the dietitians certification board is required to hold one regular meeting each year. (Current law requires two meetings.) Removes and repeals provisions concerning the application for and administration of the dietitian certification examination. Allows an individual to fit and dispense hearing aids while under the supervision and direction of a certified hearing aid dealer. Provides that certain duties of the medical licensing board are now duties of the committee of hearing aid dealer examiners. Requires that a
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Zent [R] | Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] | Rep. Patrick Bauer [D] | Rep. Ronald Bacon [R] |
Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Public Law 180 |
2018-03-21 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-14 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 390: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 401: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2018-03-14 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2018-03-08 | House | House advisors appointed: Lehman, Lyness and Taylor J |
2018-03-08 | House | House conferees appointed: Zent and Bauer |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Brown L, Lanane and Glick |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Messmer and Randolph Lonnie M |
2018-03-07 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2018-03-07 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 313: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Stoops) failed; Division of the Senate: yeas 9, nays 40 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology |
2018-01-23 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-01-22 | House | Representative Bacon added as coauthor |
2018-01-22 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Messmer |
2018-01-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 31: yeas 93, nays 2 |
2018-01-18 | House | Representative Bauer added as coauthor |
2018-01-18 | House | Representative Lehman added as coauthor |
2018-01-18 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-16 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2018-01-04 | House | Authored by Representative Zent |