IN HB1138 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Disputes involving homeowners associations. Provides that if either party requests mediation, mediation is mandatory. Provides that if neither party requests mediation, or if mediation is unsuccessful, a claimant may begin legal proceedings. Requires a mediator to be selected by the American Mediation Association. Requires a mediation to be conducted in compliance with the rules and procedures of the American Mediation Association. Makes corresponding amendments to the provisions regarding grievance resolutions involving condominium associations.
Title
Disputes involving homeowners associations. Provides that if either party requests mediation, mediation is mandatory. Provides that if neither party requests mediation, or if mediation is unsuccessful, a claimant may begin legal proceedings. Requires a mediator to be selected by the American Mediation Association. Requires a mediation to be conducted in compliance with the rules and procedures of the American Mediation Association. Makes corresponding amendments to the provisions regarding grievance resolutions involving condominium associations.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Burton [R] | Rep. Ryan Dvorak [D] | Rep. John Young [R] | Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] |
Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-02-21 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Freeman |
2019-02-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 263: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2019-02-20 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-19 | House | Representatives Young J and Steuerwald added as coauthors |
2019-02-18 | House | Representative Dvorak added as coauthor |
2019-02-18 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Burton |